Global Patent Index - EP 0927383 B1

EP 0927383 B1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE MINUTES HAND OF A WATCH WITH AT LEAST A MINUTES AND A SECONDS HAND

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE MINUTES HAND OF A WATCH WITH AT LEAST A MINUTES AND A SECONDS HAND

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN DES MINUTENZEIGERS EINER MINDESTENS MINUTEN- UND SEKUNDENZEIGER AUFWEISENDEN UHR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR REGLER L'AIGUILLE DES MINUTES SUR UNE MONTRE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UNE AIGUILLE DES MINUTES ET UNE AIGUILLE DES SECONDES

Publication

EP 0927383 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909227 A

Priority

  • DE 19638013 A
  • DE 19725793 A
  • EP 9704767 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6196713B1] An arrangement for setting the minute hand of a timepiece which has at least minute and second hands 29, having a setting stem 1 which can be moved axially out of a normal position into a setting position. In this case, upon movement of the setting stem 1 out of the normal position into the setting position, a zero setting drive of the second hand 29 can be driven such that it moves the latter into its zero position. By virtue of the setting stem 1 being moved out of the normal position in the direction of the setting position, it is possible to initiate operation of a spring-force-operated drive by means of which the zero setting drive of the second hand 29 can be driven such that it moves the latter into its zero position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6196713 B1 20010306; AT 193605 T 20000615; DE 59701823 D1 20000706; EP 0927383 A1 19990707; EP 0927383 B1 20000531; JP 2000507708 A 20000620; JP 3417953 B2 20030616; WO 9812609 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-09-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701823

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060902

2006-09-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2005-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701823 20000706

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193605 T 20000615

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991018

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI