Global Patent Index - EP 0927530 B1

EP 0927530 B1 2000-10-11 - Sliding guide-rail system for drawers

Title (en)

Sliding guide-rail system for drawers

Title (de)

Ausziehführung für Schubladen

Title (fr)

Guide de sortie pour tiroirs

Publication

EP 0927530 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121463 A

Priority

AT 219597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927530A1] The centering device ensures that the drawer is centrally positioned between the side walls (2) and at least one fixing device is provided, which after the positioning has been achieved fixes the running rails on the stop parts. Between the rails running rollers are arranged and the running rails are divided into a stop part fixed to the furniture body and a running rail for the running rib for the rollers. The running rails in relation to the stop parts are movably fitted to the side walls. The withdrawal guide is provided with a centering device, which when the drawer (3) is moved fixes the position of the running rails (76) on the stop parts (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04; A47B 88/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01); A47B 88/10 (2006.01); A47B 88/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/483 (2017.01); A47B 88/43 (2017.01); A47B 88/493 (2017.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01); A47B 2210/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927530 A1 19990707; EP 0927530 B1 20001011; AT 196834 T 20001015; DE 59800299 D1 20001116; ES 2150809 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-11-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-01-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021114

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150809 T3

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800299 20001116

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196834 T 20001015

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI