Global Patent Index - EP 0927586 A3

EP 0927586 A3 2000-03-15 - Catching box for a riveting tool

Title (en)

Catching box for a riveting tool

Title (de)

Dornsammelbehälter für ein Nietsetzgerät

Title (fr)

Collecteur de mandrins pour une riveteuse

Publication

EP 0927586 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124621 A

Priority

CZ 753998 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927586A2] A catching box for a riveting tool is tightly connected to the back part of the main operating channel (1) for the passage of torn-off pins of blind rivets. It comprises a pot-shaped solid part (2) with an inner partition (3) having a central passage opening (10) basically corresponding to the opening in the main operating channel (1). A closed housing (4) is rotatably attached to the solid part (2). The solid part (2) and the rotatable housing (4) have discharge openings (7) at their base. The inner partition (3) has an eccentrically placed rotatable disc (8) with detent of both its operating position, wherein the rotatable disc has a first opening, basically corresponding in size to the central passage opening (10) and a second, smaller opening (11), which are both situated on a circle with its center positioned on the rotation axis of the rotatable disc (8). The first opening is lined up with the central passage opening (10), when the discharge openings (7) in the solid part (2) and the rotatable housing (4) are out of line, and the second opening (11) is lined up, when the two discharge openings (7) coincide. Thereby a safe positioning of the box on the tool is achieved, making it unnecessary to check and the risk of forceful ejection of the pins of the blind rivets during emptying of the catching box is eliminated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/30 (2006.01); B21J 15/04 (2006.01); B21J 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/043 (2013.01); B21J 15/105 (2013.01); B21J 15/326 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927586 A2 19990707; EP 0927586 A3 20000315; CZ 7454 U1 19980812

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI