Global Patent Index - EP 0927615 A3

EP 0927615 A3 2000-05-17 - Plant for producing vapour-hardened building materials

Title (en)

Plant for producing vapour-hardened building materials

Title (de)

Anlage zum Herstellen von dampfgehärteten Baustoffen

Title (fr)

Installation pour l'obtention de matériaux de construction durcis à la vapeur

Publication

EP 0927615 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123357 A

Priority

DE 19800182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927615A2] In the heat chambers (11) the binding and the hardening of the concrete mass takes place under the effect of heat energy. In a sawing station (24) the bound pore concrete cakes are brought, where they are cut to the required formats. One or more heat chambers (9) receive the cut concrete cakes for storage under heat energy effect. One or more autoclaves then receive the pore concrete cakes for steam hardening. They are then passed to a cooling area (21) and all the constituents of the plant (9,11,21) have functional sections equipped with rails. A warm and heat chamber device (8) has a warm area (11) and a heating area (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 15/00; B28B 1/50; B28B 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/50 (2006.01); B28B 11/24 (2006.01); B28B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/50 (2013.01); B28B 11/245 (2013.01); B28B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927615 A2 19990707; EP 0927615 A3 20000517; EP 0927615 B1 20011107; CZ 289378 B6 20020116; CZ 9804336 A3 20000913; DE 19800182 A1 19990715; DE 19800182 C2 20000504; PL 188403 B1 20050131; PL 330688 A1 19990719

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802047 20011213

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI