Global Patent Index - EP 0927637 A4

EP 0927637 A4 2001-04-11 - INK RESERVOIR MEMBER AND INK JET RECORDING APPARATUS AND WRITING INSTRUMENT USING THE SAME

Title (en)

INK RESERVOIR MEMBER AND INK JET RECORDING APPARATUS AND WRITING INSTRUMENT USING THE SAME

Title (de)

TINTENBEHÄLTERELEMENT, TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKAPPARAT UND DIESELBEN ENTHALTENDES SCHREIBINSTRUMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE RESERVOIR D'ENCRE, APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE ET INSTRUMENT D'ECRITURE LES UTILISANT

Publication

EP 0927637 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97934740 A

Priority

  • JP 9702777 W
  • JP 21385796 A
  • JP 18830097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927637A1] An ink reservoir member is equipped with all the constituents necessary for the ink reservoir and moreover, mitigates the limit of the thickness of a blade portion, increases an ink reserving quantity and improves functionality. Further, this member is not particular in selecting the materials of sheet-like members and can use all the water base inks and the oil base inks by using an axially stretched material of polyester films, for example. Therefore, the ink reservoir member can be produced easily and economically. An ink jet recording apparatus and a writing instrument use this ink reservoir member. The ink reservoir member (13) is constituted by laminating a plurality of flat-spread sheet members (15) and a plurality of protuberance portions (16) are formed on the surface of each sheet-like member (15) with suitable gaps between them by embossing or printing. Laminated sheet-like members are positioned substantially parallel to one another with preset intervals by the protuberance portions (16) in such a fashion as to define slits (18), and all the sheet-like members (15) are in contact with a ink conduit (19). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175; B43K 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B43K 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B43K 8/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927637 A1 19990707; EP 0927637 A4 20010411; WO 9806585 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: INK RESERVOIR MEMBER AND WRITING INSTRUMENT USING THE SAME

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990301

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR