Global Patent Index - EP 0927681 B1

EP 0927681 B1 2001-04-04 - Automatic self-bailing apparatus for boat, particularly for a liferaft

Title (en)

Automatic self-bailing apparatus for boat, particularly for a liferaft

Title (de)

Automatisches Lenzgerät für Wasserfahrzeuge, insbesondere für Rettungsinsel

Title (fr)

Dispositif vide-vite à fonctionnement automatique pour embarcation, notamment pour radeau de sauvetage

Publication

EP 0927681 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98403236 A

Priority

FR 9716618 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927681A1] The system consists of a hole (4) with a grating (5) in the bottom (3) of the craft (1), connected to a supple sleeve (6), e.g. of a synthetic material, situated underneath the craft and equipped with a flotation element (7) in the form of a pneumatic pouch on its free end, which is self-closing. When there is no water in the craft the free end of the sleeve rises up against its underside at a distance from the hole and prevents any water entering the sleeve. The presence of water in the craft creates a pressure on the sleeve, causing its free end to sink and open, discharging the water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 13/00; B63C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 13/00 (2006.01); B63C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/04 (2013.01); B63B 13/00 (2013.01); B63C 2009/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927681 A1 19990707; EP 0927681 B1 20010404; AU 737272 B2 20010816; AU 9819998 A 20000608; DK 0927681 T3 20010813; FR 2773133 A1 19990702; FR 2773133 B1 20000428; US 6164232 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121221

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121221

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121221

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-04-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK GB IT

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI