Global patent index - EP 0927694 A3

EP 0927694 A3 2000-05-24 - Yarn winding method and take-up winder for yarn

Title (en)

Yarn winding method and take-up winder for yarn

Title (de)

Garnwickelverfahren und -vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de bobinage et bobinoir pour fil textile

Publication

EP 0927694 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98121968 A

Priority

JP 36786597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927694A2] To prevent "saddle-bagging" from being formed at the axial ends of yarn layers of a package a yarn winding method for a take-up winder for using a traverse device 4 to traverse a continuously supplied yarn Y and rotating a contact roller 3 in contact with a bobbin B to wind the yarn around the bobbin is disclosed, wherein a yarn-feeding roller 18 is provided on the upstream side of the contact roller, and wherein the distance between the point CP2 at which the yarn leaves the yarn-feeding roller and the first point WP at which the yarn comes in contact with the bobbin is set as a free length L that can be changed during winding so that the free length is increased to reduce the winding width W in order to prevent "saddle-bagging" from being formed at the axial ends of yarn layers in a package. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/38; B65H 54/70; B65H 67/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/385 (2013.01); B65H 54/70 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4971262 A 19901120 - TERANISHI JUNICHI [JP]
  • [A] US 4106710 A 19780815 - SCHIPPERS HEINZ, et al
  • [A] US 4431138 A 19840214 - SCHIMINSKI HERBERT [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 321 (M - 1147) 15 August 1991 (1991-08-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 201 (M - 1399) 20 April 1993 (1993-04-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 459 (M - 1467) 23 August 1993 (1993-08-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927694 A2 19990707; EP 0927694 A3 20000524; EP 0927694 B1 20030502; DE 69814019 D1 20030605; DE 69814019 T2 20040318; JP 3225910 B2 20011105; JP H11193179 A 19990721; TW 455634 B 20010921

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69814019

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69814019

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2004-05-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69814019

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 54/38 A, 7B 65H 54/70 B, 7B 65H 67/048 B

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI