Global Patent Index - EP 0927780 B1

EP 0927780 B1 2000-05-10 - Method and device for laying down and severing a roving on a roving frame

Title (en)

Method and device for laying down and severing a roving on a roving frame

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ablegen und Trennen einer Vorgarnlunte bei einer Vorspinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour déposer et séparer un ruban dans un banc à broches

Publication

EP 0927780 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122677 A

Priority

EP 97122677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927780A1] To sever the wound roving on a full roving bobbin (8), at a roving frame, a rising spiral coil (D-E) is wound round the lower bobbin cone (3), followed by shorter spiral windings (E-F) round the lower section of the bobbin winding (1). The roving bobbin (8) and the bobbin rail are moved over a following stretch (F-G-H) with reduction of the roving winding in an intermediate zone (F-G), followed by severing the roving at a rising stretch (G-H) of the bobbin winding (1). The roving bobbin (8) and the bobbin rail are moved without any roving delivery. After the roving has been severed, the bobbin rail with the roving bobbin (8) are lowered into the doffing position (H-I). An Independent claim is included for a separate and controlled drive with a control to set the separate working stages (A-I). Or a combined drive has a control to operate the separate stages (A-I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/04 (2006.01); D01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927780 A1 19990707; EP 0927780 B1 20000510; DE 59701669 D1 20000615; JP H11241236 A 19990907; US 6082658 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121222

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701669

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2005-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701669 20000615

2000-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981013

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI