Global Patent Index - EP 0927808 A3

EP 0927808 A3 2001-04-11 - Heat insulating composite profile

Title (en)

Heat insulating composite profile

Title (de)

Wärmegedämmtes Verbundprofil

Title (fr)

Profilé composite thermiquement isolant

Publication

EP 0927808 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106735 A

Priority

  • DE 19532772 A
  • EP 96937182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709504A1] The invention concerns a heat-insulated composite profiled section comprising an insulation weg (6) having two substantially parallel delimiting walls (6.1, 6.2) which form a cavity therebetween. The delimiting walls (6.1, 6.2) can be interconnected by at least one transverse web (10). From an initial wall thickness s = 0.5 mm and a heat conductivity lambda = 0.35 W/mK of the delimiting walls (6.1, 6.2), the width (D) of the insulation web is set at 20 mm in oder to achieve thermal insulance of the insulation web in the range of from 0.15 m<2>K/W to 0.30 m<2>K/W, 30 mm for thermal insulance in the range of from 0.25 m<2>K/W to 0.50 m<2>K/W, 40 mm for thermal insulance in the range of from 0.35 m<2>K/W to 0.65 m<2>K/W, and 50 mm for thermal insulance in the range of from 0.40 m<2>K/W to 0.80 m<2>K/W. Therefore, the width (d) of the cavity or hollow chamber is less than or equal to the width (D) of the insulation web and greater than or equal to one third of the width (D) of the insulation web, provided the height of the cavity or hollow chamber (11) is less than or equal to 5 mm. If the height of the cavity or hollow chamber is between 5 mm and 20 mm and at least one transverse web (10) is present, the ratio of height (h) to width (d) is greater than or equal to 0.2 and less than or equal to 5. For a variation in the wall thickness (s) of between 0.25 mm and 1.0 mm, a dependency of the thermal insulance on the wall thickness (s) according to the relation: R(s)=R(s=0.25 mm) + (s - 0.25)/0.25 * DELTA R, with the value of DELTA R ranging from 0.025 to 0.05, has to be taken into account. Increasing the heat conductivity of the delimiting walls (6.1, 6.2) by 10 % in the range of from 0.15 W/mK to 0.40 W/mK reduces the thermal insulance by between 2 and 4 %, which is to be taken into account accordingly for the dimensions initially selected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/18 (2006.01); E06B 3/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26332 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709504 A1 19970313; AT 186967 T 19991215; AT 232936 T 20030315; CA 2231102 A1 19970313; CZ 9800659 A3 19980715; DK 0927808 T3 20030519; EP 0848781 A1 19980624; EP 0848781 B1 19991124; EP 0927808 A2 19990707; EP 0927808 A3 20010411; EP 0927808 B1 20030219; JP H11512158 A 19991019; NO 309782 B1 20010326; NO 980935 A 19980427; NO 980935 D0 19980304; PL 181284 B1 20010731; PL 325156 A1 19980706

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-14 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030219

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030219

2010-10-20 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20100713

2010-10-20 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20100713

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080905

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

2004-01-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59610159

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-02-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0848781

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 848781

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE