Global Patent Index - EP 0927809 A3

EP 0927809 A3 2000-08-02 - A fire-resistant bulding element

Title (en)

A fire-resistant bulding element

Title (de)

Brandschutz-Bauelement

Title (fr)

Elément de construction coupe-feu

Publication

EP 0927809 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124076 A

Priority

SE 9704819 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927809A2] A fire-resistant building element for a facade or the like includes at least one window pane (1) and an aluminium frame (2) therefore. Glass clips (5, 6) for mounting the window pane to the frame are made of stainless steel and are attached to aluminium profiles (3) of the frame at opposite sides of the window pane. The profiles (3) are connected by isolators or thermal breaks (4), and the hollow space hereby defined contains a fire isolating fillet (10). The glass clips have a minimal width and are provided with slots (5B) for minimizing the heat conduction. The fire isolating fillet has a core (10A) of hard board and at each side thereof gypsum strips (10B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/165 (2013.01); E06B 3/2632 (2013.01); E06B 3/5409 (2013.01); E06B 3/5835 (2013.01); E06B 5/164 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26321 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26359 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26392 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26394 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927809 A2 19990707; EP 0927809 A3 20000802; EP 0927809 B1 20040519; DK 0927809 T3 20040927; PT 927809 E 20041029; SE 512278 C2 20000221; SE 9704819 D0 19971219; SE 9704819 L 19990620

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-06-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAPA BUILDING SYSTEM AB, SE

- Effective date: 20070330

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-09-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB PT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK FR GB PT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB PT

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI