Global Patent Index - EP 0927959 A3

EP 0927959 A3 2000-09-27 - Postage metering system and method for automatic detection of remote postage security devices on a network

Title (en)

Postage metering system and method for automatic detection of remote postage security devices on a network

Title (de)

Frankiersystem und Verfahren zur automatischen Detektion von ferngesteuerten Frankiersicherheitsvorrichtungen in einem Netz

Title (fr)

Système d'affranchissement et procédé pour la détection automatique des dispositifs de sécurité d'affranchissement à distance dans un reseau

Publication

EP 0927959 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124248 A

Priority

US 99335397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0927959A2] A postage metering system (10) includes a plurality of printer modules (20, 22) connected as part of a network and operating as clients on the network. Postal security devices (40) (PSDs) are coupled the clients (20, 22). Each PSD (40) is local to the coupled client functioning as a host to the PSD and remote to the other of the plurality of clients. The PSD includes unique identification, postal value storage and a digital signature generator. The clients function as a postage metering network (10) wherein a client requests evidence of postage payment from a remote PSD (40) for concluding postage metering transactions. Each of the clients determines which of the remote PSDs are available for metering transactions on the network by broadcast messages and requests. In one embodiment, a broadcast request for the identity of remote PSDs whose host is logged onto the network is sent over the network by a client when the client logs onto the network. Additional broadcast requests are periodically sent over the network by the client to other clients logged onto the network. Broadcast messages indicating the unique identification of the PSD coupled to a host are sent over the network by the host when the host logs onto the network. Additional broadcast messages are sent periodically over the network by the host. Another broadcast message indicating that a PSD is no longer available is sent over the network by the host when it logs off the network. In alternate embodiments a network server controls broadcast requests and messages. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 61/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00096 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00137 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00201 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0927959 A2 19990707; EP 0927959 A3 20000927; EP 0927959 B1 20100505; AU 762204 B2 20030619; AU 9717898 A 19990708; BR 9805464 A 19991116; CA 2255998 A1 19990618; CA 2255998 C 20030916; CN 1145903 C 20040414; CN 1223414 A 19990721; DE 69841647 D1 20100617; ES 2342349 T3 20100705; JP H11328464 A 19991130; US 6098058 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Effective date: 20110207

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121219

2014-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140307

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121219

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-28 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R026

- Ref Document Number: 69841647

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-03-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Effective date: 20110207

2010-08-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2010-07-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2342349

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2010-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69841647

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2010-05-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070419

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI