Global Patent Index - EP 0928126 A3

EP 0928126 A3 2001-04-04 - Method and arrangement for observing the operational status of an electrical device

Title (en)

Method and arrangement for observing the operational status of an electrical device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Beobachtung des Betriebszustandes eines elektrischen Geräts

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour détecter le bon fonctionnement d' un appareil électrique

Publication

EP 0928126 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100122 A

Priority

FI 980013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928126A2] The present invention relates to a method of monitoring and/or controlling the operation status of an electrical apparatus (1) from a distance from the apparatus. Factors having an effect on the various operation statuses of the electrical apparatus, such as various components causing the fault condition, are identified by means of suitable transducers (10) and wirelessly indicated by means of transmitters using electromagnetic signals. The invention also relates to an apparatus performing the method. Industrial lighting fixtures are an advantageous application of the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928126 A2 19990707; EP 0928126 A3 20010404; EP 0928126 B1 20040331; AT 263476 T 20040415; DE 69915893 D1 20040506; DE 69915893 T2 20050120; FI 113500 B 20040430; FI 980013 A0 19980105; FI 980013 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915893 P 20040506

2004-04-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AALTO, VEIJO

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR SE

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALO OY

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI