Global Patent Index - EP 0928152 B1

EP 0928152 B1 2000-12-13 - VACUUM CLEANER FOR HOUSEHOLD REFUSE

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER FOR HOUSEHOLD REFUSE

Title (de)

HAUSHALTSSTAUBSAUGER

Title (fr)

ASPIRATEUR POUR DECHETS MENAGERS

Publication

EP 0928152 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97910353 A

Priority

  • CH 235696 A
  • EP 9705257 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6141822A] PCT No. PCT/EP97/05257 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 24, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 24, 1999 PCT Filed Sep. 24, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO98/12957 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 2, 1998The invention concerns a vacuum cleaner including an internal structure with a motor (12a) driving an air sucking turbine (12) located in a downstream chamber (16) communicating with an upstream chamber (15) containing means (13, 26) for filtering the air sucked in through an air intake (24). The internal structure is enclosed in an inflatable peripheral structure (30) supplied with air through the air outlet (29) of the downstream chamber (16). The inflatable peripheral structure (30) is delimited by a flexible peripheral wall (32) whose envelope completely encloses the assembly of the vacuum cleaner internal structure. The invention is applicable to vacuum cleaners for household refuse, and provides at an inexpensive and efficient protection against collisions between the vacuum cleaner and surrounding objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/36 (2006.01); A47L 7/06 (2006.01); A47L 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/06 (2013.01); A47L 5/36 (2013.01); A47L 9/009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6141822 A 20001107; AU 4778197 A 19980417; CA 2267242 A1 19980402; CH 691565 A5 20010831; CN 1231587 A 19991013; DE 69703698 D1 20010118; EP 0928152 A1 19990714; EP 0928152 B1 20001213; JP 2001504001 A 20010327; WO 9812957 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CERTECH S.A.

- Free text: CERTECH S.A.#CHEMIN DE LULASSE 6#1253 VANDOEUVRES (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CERTECH S.A.#CHEMIN DE LULASSE 6#1253 VANDOEUVRES (CH)

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-06-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2001-03-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-01-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703698 20010118

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT SE

2000-12-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT SE