Global patent index - EP 0928208 A4

EP 0928208 A4 2000-10-18 - INSTRUMENTATION FOR SURGICAL ENDOSCOPIC INSERTION AND APPLICATION OF LIQUID, GEL AND LIKE MATERIAL

Title (en)

INSTRUMENTATION FOR SURGICAL ENDOSCOPIC INSERTION AND APPLICATION OF LIQUID, GEL AND LIKE MATERIAL

Title (de)

INSTRUMENTIERUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHE ENDOSKOPEINFÜHRUNG UND ANBRINGEN VON FLÜSSIGKEIT ,GEL UND ÄHNLICHEN STOFFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUVANT ETRE INTRODUIT DANS L'ABDOMEN AFIN D'APPLIQUER UN LIQUIDE, UN GEL OU UNE SUBSTANCE MEDICALE APPARENTEE

Publication

EP 0928208 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917791 A

Priority

  • US 9705397 W
  • US 71886196 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/00; A61B 17/00; A61M 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61M 3/02 (2006.01); A61M 5/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928208 A1 19990714; EP 0928208 A4 20001018

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-11-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021125

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61M 5/00 A, 7A 61M 3/02 B, 7A 61B 17/00 B

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980929

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE