Global Patent Index - EP 0928354 B1

EP 0928354 B1 2000-05-10 - AN ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A PLATE-SHAPED FLOOR MEMBER, AN ASSEMBLY COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO SPACED-APART SECTIONS AND AT LEAST ONE FLOOR MEMBER EXTENDING BETWEEN SAID SECTIONS, AS WELL AS A FLOOR MEMBER AND A SECTION SUITABLE FOR SUCH ASSEMBLIES

Title (en)

AN ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A PLATE-SHAPED FLOOR MEMBER, AN ASSEMBLY COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO SPACED-APART SECTIONS AND AT LEAST ONE FLOOR MEMBER EXTENDING BETWEEN SAID SECTIONS, AS WELL AS A FLOOR MEMBER AND A SECTION SUITABLE FOR SUCH ASSEMBLIES

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENBAU MIT EINEM PLATTENFÖRMIGEN BODENELEMENT, EIN ZUSAMMENBAU MIT WENIGSTENS ZWEI RÄUMLICH GETRENNTEN BAUTEILEN UND WENIGSTENS EINEM BODENELEMENT, WELCHES SICH ZWISCHEN DIESEN BAUTEILEN BEFINDET, SOWIE EIN FÜR DIESEN ZUSAMMENBAU GEEIGNETES BODENELEMENT UND BAUTEIL

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UN ELEMENT PLANCHER EN FORME DE PLAQUE, ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX PROFILES ESPACES ET AU MOINS UN ELEMENT PLANCHER S'ETENDANT ENTRE LESDITS PROFILES, AINSI QU'ELEMENT PLANCHER ET PROFILE UTILES POUR DE TELS ENSEMBLES

Publication

EP 0928354 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940489 A

Priority

  • NL 9700530 W
  • NL 1004128 A
  • NL 1006073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813560A1] An assembly comprising a plate-shaped floor member (2) provided with a plate (3) and at least two ribs (4) between which a trench (8) is present. At least one rib bounding the trench is provided with at least one passage (5), which extends from said trench to a side of the rib remote from said trench. The assembly furthermore comprises at least one conduit (9) present in the trench, which conduit extends through said passage. The ribs are present on the upper side of the plate, with a plate-shaped covering (7) being present on or between said ribs on a side remote from said plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/48; E04B 5/02; E04B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/02 (2006.01); E04B 5/10 (2006.01); E04B 5/48 (2006.01); E04C 2/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/48 (2013.01); E04B 5/04 (2013.01); E04B 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813560 A1 19980402; AT 192811 T 20000515; AU 4225597 A 19980417; DE 69701998 D1 20000615; DE 69701998 T2 20001221; EP 0928354 A1 19990714; EP 0928354 B1 20000510; JP 2001500936 A 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-10 [REG BE MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170923

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170922

2017-10-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170922

2017-09-27 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170922

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701998

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160901

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-01-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-08-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: INFRA+ B.V.

- Effective date: 20080423

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-09-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701998 20000615

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192811 T 20000515

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990301

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE