Global Patent Index - EP 0928365 B1

EP 0928365 B1 2001-12-19 - STEAM TURBINE, STEAM TURBINE PLANT AND METHOD OF COOLING A STEAM TURBINE

Title (en)

STEAM TURBINE, STEAM TURBINE PLANT AND METHOD OF COOLING A STEAM TURBINE

Title (de)

DAMPFTURBINE, DAMPFTURBINENANLAGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ABKÜHLUNG EINER DAMPFTURBINE

Title (fr)

TURBINE A VAPEUR, INSTALLATION DE TURBINE A VAPEUR ET PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE TURBINE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0928365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943771 A

Priority

  • DE 9702058 W
  • DE 19639714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813588A1] The invention concerns a steam turbine (1) comprising a steam-inlet region (2), an exhaust steam region (3) and a blading region (4) which is disposed axially therebetween and is surrounded by a turbine housing (5). Further provided is a cooling fluid inlet (7) which can be closed and opened by a closure member (8) and through which the cooling fluid (6) can be introduced into the turbine housing (5). The introduced cooling fluid (6) can be discharged from the turbine housing (5) again via a suction device (10) for drawing off cooling fluid (6). The invention further concerns a steam turbine plant (20), and a method of cooling a steam turbine (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 13/02; F01D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/12 (2006.01); F01D 25/14 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01); F01K 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 13/025 (2013.01); F01D 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813588 A1 19980402; CN 1091210 C 20020918; CN 1231714 A 19991013; EP 0928365 A1 19990714; EP 0928365 B1 20011219; JP 2001500943 A 20010123; JP 4127854 B2 20080730; KR 20000048655 A 20000725; US 6145317 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170911

2017-10-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170911

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705905

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705905 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOBRECHT, EDWIN

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WECHSUNG, MICHAEL

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOBRECHT, EDWIN

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WECHSUNG, MICHAEL

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990319

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI