Global Patent Index - EP 0928405 B1

EP 0928405 B1 2000-08-09 - PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER, ESPECIALLY OIL/COOLANT COOLER IN VEHICLES

Title (en)

PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER, ESPECIALLY OIL/COOLANT COOLER IN VEHICLES

Title (de)

PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER, INSBESONDERE ÖL/KÜHLMITTEL-KÜHLER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLAQUES, NOTAMMENT REFROIDISSEUR D'HUILE/REFRIGERANT POUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 0928405 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933510 A

Priority

  • DE 9801317 W
  • DE 19722074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722074A1] Disclosed is a heat exchanger comprising superimposed heat exchanger plates (2, 2'), a collar (4), fluid connectors (12), connecting holes (5) and fastening means which present at least one passage (15) comprised of holes (6, 27) in alignment towards each other in the plates (2, 2'), through which a tension rod (16) can be passed. One end of said rod (16) rests upon the connecting plate (26) or the plate (2, 2') adjacent thereto. In the hole (6, 27) alignment area, each thermal plate is tight relative to the adjacent plate (2, 2').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/08 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 2275/205 (2013.01); Y10S 165/916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722074 A1 19981203; EP 0928405 A2 19990714; EP 0928405 B1 20000809; ES 2150815 T3 20001201; JP 2001526765 A 20011218; JP 3898768 B2 20070328; US 6161615 A 20001219; WO 9854527 A2 19981203; WO 9854527 A3 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150815 T3

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800230 20000914

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAHLE FILTERSYSTEME GMBH

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990420

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB