Global Patent Index - EP 0928492 B1

EP 0928492 B1 2000-12-06 - SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING ELECTRICAL DEVICES AGAINST OVERHEATING

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING ELECTRICAL DEVICES AGAINST OVERHEATING

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON ELEKTRISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN GEGEN ÜBERHITZEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EVITER LES PHENOMENES DE SURCHAUFFE DANS DES APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 0928492 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909150 A

Priority

  • DE 9702111 W
  • DE 19639942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19639942A1] In order to protect electrical devices against overheating, a thermal fuse (8) is provided which is accommodated inside a housing of the electrical device to be protected. The thermal fuse (8), which is made from low-melting metal, is disposed in the immediate vicinity of a critical element (3) of the electrical device, is preferably U- or V-shaped, and arranged such that its vertex (83) is located in the immediate vicinity of the critical element (3), for example a PCT thermistor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/76; H01H 61/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/02 (2006.01); H01H 37/32 (2006.01); H01H 37/76 (2006.01); H01H 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 61/002 (2013.01); H01H 37/761 (2013.01); H01H 2085/0483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639942 A1 19980402; DE 19639942 C2 19990701; AT 198008 T 20001215; BR 9711577 A 19990824; CN 1231759 A 19991013; DK 0928492 T3 20010305; EP 0928492 A1 19990714; EP 0928492 B1 20001206; ES 2153184 T3 20010216; JP 2001504628 A 20010403; KR 20000048633 A 20000725; US 6222715 B1 20010424; WO 9813846 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030919

2004-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030918

2002-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-02 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020902

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153184 T3

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702740 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198008 T 20001215

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991103

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990319

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT