Global Patent Index - EP 0928583 A3

EP 0928583 A3 2000-08-02 - Washable mattress cover

Title (en)

Washable mattress cover

Title (de)

Waschbarer Bezug für Matratzen

Title (fr)

Revêtement de matelas lavable

Publication

EP 0928583 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100221 A

Priority

DE 19800861 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928583A2] The cover contains at least one further textile layer and a bulky cotton web at least 3 mm thick between this extra textile layer and the textile upper layer, these three layers being joined together by threads. The barrier layer is laminated onto the extra textile layer after the latter layer has been secured to the upper and cotton web layers. The barrier layer is water vapor permeable, but impermeable to water and allergens. An Independent claim is also included for a mattress fitted with one of these covers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/06; A47C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/007 (2013.01); A47C 27/006 (2013.01); Y10T 428/239 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24033 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24041 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2405 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3537 (2015.04); Y10T 442/365 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3707 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928583 A2 19990714; EP 0928583 A3 20000802; EP 0928583 B1 20030423; US 6174584 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905121

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905121 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI