Global Patent Index - EP 0928636 A3

EP 0928636 A3 2000-05-03 - Coating apparatus

Title (en)

Coating apparatus

Title (de)

Beschichtungsapparat

Title (fr)

Appareil de revêtement

Publication

EP 0928636 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100089 A

Priority

JP 232698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928636A2] In a coating apparatus provided with a conveyor to convey a substrate to be coated; and a coater including two surfaces (a,b) opposite to each other so that a slit is formed therebetween, a coating solution is introduced from an inlet of the slit, passes through the slit between the two surfaces and is discharged from the outlet of the slit, the gap distance d of the slit at the outlet being made so as to satisfy the following formula: 0 < d 50 x 10<-5> (m), and at least a part of the outlet section of the two surfaces (a,b) being formed by a member having a water-repelling property. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; G11B 5/848

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928636 A2 19990714; EP 0928636 A3 20000503; JP H11197576 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 05C 5/02 A, 7G 11B 5/848 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI