Global Patent Index - EP 0928649 A3

EP 0928649 A3 2000-03-15 - Suction device for holding rivets in a riveting tool

Title (en)

Suction device for holding rivets in a riveting tool

Title (de)

Saugvorrichtung zum Halten von Nieten in einem Nietwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration pour le maintien de rivets dans une riveteuse

Publication

EP 0928649 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204028 A

Priority

CZ 753898 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928649A2] The device for suctioning the rivets in a riveting tool involves a hydraulically controlled clamping assembly with a hydraulic piston (2). The device consists of a tube (4) passing through the axial central passage opening of the hydraulic piston (2), the back end (23) of which is fitted in the rear screw joint (15) closing off the body (1) of the riveting tool in the part forming the cylinder (18); into the forward end (22) of the tube (4) there is pressed a small hollow piston (3) between whose inner elongated end (25) and the tube (4) there is a ring-shaped space (17) in which area the tube (4) is provided with at least one opening (5) connected with the supply of pressurized air. The tube (4) has clearance along the whole length of its positioning in the hydraulic piston (2), where the ring-shaped gap (27) thus created between the tube (4) and the body of the hollow hydraulic piston (2) forms a connection between the opening (5) of the tube (4) and the space (6) in the cylinder (18) of the hydraulic piston (2) connected to the supply of pressurized air, while the outer shoulder (7) of the small piston (3) with its radial projection (8) reaches the inner shoulder (29) of the hydraulic piston (2) under pressure from the compression spring (9) of the spacing mandrel (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/32 (2006.01); B21J 15/04 (2006.01); B21J 15/06 (2006.01); B21J 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/043 (2013.01); B21J 15/105 (2013.01); B21J 15/326 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928649 A2 19990714; EP 0928649 A3 20000315; EP 0928649 B1 20030611; CZ 7414 U1 19980812

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815484 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI