Global Patent Index - EP 0928664 A3

EP 0928664 A3 2001-05-02 - Handdriven toggle lever clamp

Title (en)

Handdriven toggle lever clamp

Title (de)

Als Handspanner ausgebildete Kniehebelspannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à genouillère actionné à main

Publication

EP 0928664 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114147 A

Priority

DE 29800221 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928664A2] The housing (1) comprises two parallel plates with a gap between for the mounting of the articulated lever arrangement. Beneath the axle (5) fixed to the housing for the clamping arm (4) is an adjusting thrust piece (18) restricting the swivel angle of the clamping arm. The hand lever (9) has a thrust piece (19) limiting its swivel angle, between the two housing plates. The hand lever has a leg spring (15,16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822135 U1 19990218; EP 0928664 A2 19990714; EP 0928664 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980818

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI