Global Patent Index - EP 0928667 A3

EP 0928667 A3 2001-05-23 - Internal combustion fastener driving tool aluminium cylinder

Title (en)

Internal combustion fastener driving tool aluminium cylinder

Title (de)

Verbrennungskraftbetriebenes Werkzeug zum Eintreiben von Befestigungsmitteln mit Wechselventil

Title (fr)

Outil entraîné par gaz de combustion pour enforcer des attaches avec clapet avec soupape à tiroir

Publication

EP 0928667 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98310766 A

Priority

US 219997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928667A2] The present invention relates to an aluminium cylinder for an internal combustion fastener driving tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928667 A2 19990714; EP 0928667 A3 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI