Global Patent Index - EP 0928671 B1

EP 0928671 B1 2003-06-04 - Cutting device for plastic material

Title (en)

Cutting device for plastic material

Title (de)

Schneidegerät für Körper aus Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe pour matériaux synthétique

Publication

EP 0928671 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810008 A

Priority

EP 98810008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928671A1] The swiveling axis (37) lies between the guiding device (15) and the platform (13) in the plane of the latter and in the cutting plane of the cutting wire (19). The platform (13) and a bearing (29) for the swiveling guide (15) lie adjacent to and at a distance from each other on a crossbar (11) and the blade support (17) is guided between the platform and the bearing. A supporting leg (67) slides inside the crossbar which runs parallel to the cutting wire (19). A mitering plate (39) on the crossbar is perpendicular to the cutting wire and enables the swiveling movement of the guide to be fixed at any given position. The swiveling guide comprises two bars (81) guided through two holes in a slide and is located on only one side of the equipment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 3/12; B26D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/547 (2006.01); B26D 3/02 (2006.01); B26F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/006 (2013.01); B26D 1/547 (2013.01); B26D 3/02 (2013.01); B26F 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928671 A1 19990714; EP 0928671 B1 20030604; AT 242092 T 20030615; DE 59808618 D1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130112

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808618

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242092 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808618 P 20030710

2003-07-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KAMBO AG

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAMBO AG

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2000-03-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI