Global Patent Index - EP 0928839 B1

EP 0928839 B1 2002-09-04 - Apparatus for removing fiber flocks and method for making teeth of a plucking cylinder

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing fiber flocks and method for making teeth of a plucking cylinder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abtragen von Faserflocken und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zähnen einer Abtragwalze

Title (fr)

Appareil pour prélever des flocons de fibres et procédé de fabrication des dents d'un cylindre extracteur

Publication

EP 0928839 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811142 A

Priority

DE 19800371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928839A1] The roller shaft (6) carries a mounting tube (3) that is preferably made by joining two half tubes (3a,3b). The tube is of polygonal section and has teeth (2) attached to the flat sides in such a way that they can be changed, e.g. by attaching them with bolts. Independent claims are included for: (1) teeth made from steel sheet metal with a chamfered edge; and (2) sheet metal teeth shaped in the flat state and subsequently bent to their final configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928839 A1 19990714; EP 0928839 B1 20020904; DE 19800371 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081118

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805405 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI