Global Patent Index - EP 0928844 A3

EP 0928844 A3 2000-06-07 - Paper calender and method of operating the same

Title (en)

Paper calender and method of operating the same

Title (de)

Papierkalander und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb

Title (fr)

Calandre à papier et son procédé d' opération

Publication

EP 0928844 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124391 A

Priority

DE 19800331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928844A2] Units adjusting mechanical pressure are so sturdily dimensioned, that they can compensate more than the total weight of the roller and components connected to it. An Independent claim is included for the method of operation, in which loading in upper and lower stacks differs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928844 A2 19990714; EP 0928844 A3 20000607; CA 2258136 A1 19990708; DE 19800331 A1 19990715; US 6129011 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041006

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI