Global Patent Index - EP 0928845 A3

EP 0928845 A3 2000-04-19 - Device for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web, especially paper or board

Title (en)

Device for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web, especially paper or board

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn, insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer un liquide ou un produit pâteux sur une bande en mouvement, particulièrement de papier ou de carton

Publication

EP 0928845 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100508 A

Priority

DE 19800954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928845A2] Before the dryer (26) there is a unit (30, 32, 34) moistening and/or heating the web (16) and/or the coating material (20) or the layer coated (24). An Independent claim is included for the corresponding coating method. Preferred features: The moistening and/or heating unit produces and/or supplies vapor, especially water vapor or steam. It may spray fluid, especially water. The moistening and/or heating unit is located immediately ahead of the coating location. The unit delivers vapor or a spray of mist towards the coating location. It includes a steam supply line (36) with openings (36a) directed appropriately. Nozzles and/or wall sections used, taper in the outlet direction. The unit is located behind the coating location. It is located before or after a device leveling and/or metering the coating layer. It directs steam or liquid spray perpendicular to the web. It has a steam supply line (32a, 34a) with steam outlets facing the web. Steam outlets extend over a distance of 0.1-200 cm, preferably 50-100 cm. A series of steaming or spraying sections reach across the web, each individually controlled. A suction unit (40) is included, behind the moistening unit. When using a leveling- and/or dosing unit (22) the suction unit is connected to a coating medium interception unit (22d).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 9/14 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/06 (2013.01); Y10S 118/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928845 A2 19990714; EP 0928845 A3 20000419; DE 19800954 A1 19990715; JP H11253867 A 19990921; US 6309463 B1 20011030; US 6309704 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR IT SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI