Global Patent Index - EP 0928858 A3

EP 0928858 A3 2000-03-01 - Process and apparatus for manufacturing a lamella for a light building panel

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for manufacturing a lamella for a light building panel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Lamelle für ein Leichbaupaneel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'une lamelle pour un panneau léger

Publication

EP 0928858 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300244 A

Priority

SI 9800006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928858A2] In a process and apparatus for manufacturing a lamella (7) for use in a light building panel (1) the lamella is used for improving the mechanical characteristics of the panel. The process for its manufacture comprises four sub-processes; i.e. input, cutting, exit, and suction of the remnants of the manufacturing process. The apparatus for the lamella's manufacture comprises inlet (9), cutting ensemble (10), exit (11), and suction ensemble (12) for suction of the remnants of the manufacturing process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/292; B23D 45/10; B26D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928858 A2 19990714; EP 0928858 A3 20000301; SI 9800006 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 2/292 A, 7B 23D 45/10 B, 7B 26D 3/02 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI