Global Patent Index - EP 0928866 A3

EP 0928866 A3 2001-05-02 - Lock with latch bolt

Title (en)

Lock with latch bolt

Title (de)

Schloss mit Falle

Title (fr)

Serrure avec pêne à demi-tour

Publication

EP 0928866 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124721 A

Priority

DE 19800468 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928866A2] A roller (27) is housed in an opening (26) in the angled bolt head surface (20) and its radius protrudes beyond the angled surface. The lock (1) contains a bolt (8) whose head (9) has an a surface sloping at an angle to the bolt movement direction and a catch surface (15) extending parallel to the bolt movement direction. The bolt head end wall (21) can be retracted into a cuff opening (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/10; E05B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/044 (2013.01); E05B 15/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928866 A2 19990714; EP 0928866 A3 20010502; EP 0928866 B1 20081022; EP 0928866 B8 20090304; DE 19800468 A1 19990715; DE 59814308 D1 20081204

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131228

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814308

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131228

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814308

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121204

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814308 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CESLOCKES GMBH

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI