Global Patent Index - EP 0928869 B1

EP 0928869 B1 2000-07-05 - Locking armature for door, window-door or the same

Title (en)

Locking armature for door, window-door or the same

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag für Tür, Fenstertür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage pour porte, porte-fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0928869 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440001 A

Priority

  • FR 9800284 A
  • FR 9803504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928868A1] The lock has a control mechanism (3) with automatic return springs (8) for an actuating bar (4), and a lever (21) to hold the bar in its unlocked position when the door is opened. The lever is able to turn inside the lock housing on a pivot (22) lying across the housing's lengthwise axis, moving between an inactive position and an active one in which it interacts with a stop (26) fixed directly or indirectly to the bar (4), opposing the movement of the latter by the springs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2013.01); E05B 2063/207 (2013.01); E05C 9/002 (2013.01); Y10S 292/24 (2013.01); Y10T 292/098 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1016 (2015.04); Y10T 292/558 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928869 A1 19990714; EP 0928869 B1 20000705; AT 196178 T 20000915; DE 69800295 D1 20001012; DE 69800295 T2 20010222; DE 69900006 D1 20000810; DE 69900006 T2 20010308; DK 0928868 T3 20001227; EP 0928868 A1 19990714; EP 0928868 B1 20000906; ES 2151762 T3 20010101; FR 2773579 A1 19990716; FR 2773579 B1 20000915; GR 3034914 T3 20010228; US 6361087 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030202

2003-06-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20030202

2003-01-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030122

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WINKHAUS GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900006 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990419

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI