Global Patent Index - EP 0928899 A3

EP 0928899 A3 2000-05-03 - Once-through blower

Title (en)

Once-through blower

Title (de)

Querstromlüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur à courant transversal

Publication

EP 0928899 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98114422 A

Priority

JP 360698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928899A2] A once-through blower including a once-through impeller (8) is described. The blower includes a blowout duct (10), a stabilizer (13) and a scroll casing (9). The stabilizer (13) provided at an end of the blowout duct (10) so as to face the once-through impeller (8). The scroll casing (9) is provided at the back of the once-through impeller (8) and connected to the blowout duct (10). The stabilizer (13) has a curved surface (18) which is formed along an arc (15). The diameter of the arc (15) is 103% or more of that of the once-through impeller (8). The scroll casing (9) has an interior curved surface (19) which is formed along a casing arc. The casing arc is concentric with the arc center (21). A clearance between a predetermined outer peripheral point (23) of the once-through impeller (8) and the inflow-side end of the scroll casing (9) is set so as to become 3% or more of the diameter of the once-through impeller (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 17/04; F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/422 (2013.01); F04D 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928899 A2 19990714; EP 0928899 A3 20000503; EP 0928899 B1 20040107; CN 1115523 C 20030723; CN 1223360 A 19990721; DE 69820976 D1 20040212; DE 69820976 T2 20041021; ES 2212179 T3 20040716; HK 1021656 A1 20040416; JP 3649567 B2 20050518; JP H11201487 A 19990730; TW 360767 B 19990611

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69820976

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212179 T3

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820976 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI