Global patent index - EP 0928926 A3

EP 0928926 A3 2001-04-18 - Luminaire

Title (en)

Luminaire

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire

Publication

EP 0928926 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204218 A

Priority

  • EP 98204218 A
  • EP 98200013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928926A2] The claimed luminaire comprises an elongated container (1) with walls (2) and closed ends (3). The container (1) comprises an electrical supply (4) for the operation of an electrical lamp (30). Transverse containers (11) comprising lamp holders (10) are fixed to walls (2) of container (1). By virtue of the presence of additional transverse containers (11), luminaires are obtained in which more than one lamp can be accommodated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 3/00; F21V 15/01; F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/06 (2006.01); F21V 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/06 (2013.01); F21S 4/20 (2016.01); F21S 8/031 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928926 A2 19990714; EP 0928926 A3 20010418; EP 0928926 B1 20070228

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161006 AND 20161012

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69837191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69837191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69837191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2008-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-04-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-25 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: F21V 15/01 20060101AFI20070122BHEP

2007-04-25 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: F21V 19/00 20060101ALI20070122BHEP

2007-04-25 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: F21S 8/00 20060101ALI20070122BHEP

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69837191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-02-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 3/00 A, 7F 21V 15/01 B, 7F 21V 19/00 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI