Global Patent Index - EP 0928934 A3

EP 0928934 A3 2000-03-22 - Domestic refrigerator

Title (en)

Domestic refrigerator

Title (de)

Haushaltkühlschrank

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur ménager

Publication

EP 0928934 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124862 A

Priority

IT VA980002 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928934A2] A domestic refrigerator has a coolant circuit with a capillary (16) interposed between the condenser (N) and the evaporator (E). Said capillary is arranged in the space between the refrigerator compartment (10a) and the freezer compartment (10b) in order to raise the temperature of the upper wall (12b) of the refrigerator compartment and to prevent the condensation of water vapour on said wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/02; F25B 41/06; F25D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/06 (2006.01); F25D 11/02 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01); F25D 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/067 (2013.01); F25D 11/022 (2013.01); F25D 23/061 (2013.01); F25B 2400/052 (2013.01); F25D 21/04 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928934 A2 19990714; EP 0928934 A3 20000322; EP 0928934 B1 20040407; DE 69822997 D1 20040513; DE 69822997 T2 20050421; ES 2218753 T3 20041116; IT 246294 Y1 20020408; IT VA980002 U1 19990709; IT VA980002 V0 19980109; PT 928934 E 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170707

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69822997

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218753 T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402167

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822997 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GR IT PT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25D 11/02 A, 7F 25B 41/06 B, 7F 25D 21/04 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI