Global Patent Index - EP 0928946 A3

EP 0928946 A3 2000-11-15 - Device for pivotally mounting linear driving mechanisms on armoured vehicles

Title (en)

Device for pivotally mounting linear driving mechanisms on armoured vehicles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur schwenkbaren Lagerung von Linearantrieben an gepanzerten Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour monter un moteur linéaire de façon pivotante sur un véhicule blindé

Publication

EP 0928946 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120461 A

Priority

DE 19800662 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0928946A2] The military tank carries equipment for laying a bridge across a river. Plate-like fixtures (2) on either side of an opening in the roof of the tank have cutout corner regions (7) for receiving bearing plates (4) housing the bearing journals for the hydraulic cylinder (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0928946 A2 19990714; EP 0928946 A3 20001115; EP 0928946 B1 20030319; DE 19800662 A1 19990715; DE 19800662 C2 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161030

2017-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-06-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807543

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807543 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE NL SE

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE NL SE

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE NL SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI