Global Patent Index - EP 0929126 A3

EP 0929126 A3 2000-10-18 - Connector having electronic component

Title (en)

Connector having electronic component

Title (de)

Steckverbinder mit elektronischem Baulelement

Title (fr)

Connecteur ayant composant électronique

Publication

EP 0929126 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98403227 A

Priority

DE 19800802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0929126A2] The plug connector has a cable, electrical contacts, a housing with an aperture and an electronic component in the aperture and connected to at least one contact or wire in the cable. The electronic component (6) is mounted on a circuit board (5) and its electrical connection is performed via conducting tracks (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/66; H01R 23/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6658 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0929126 A2 19990714; EP 0929126 A3 20001018; EP 0929126 B1 20080220; DE 19800802 A1 19990715; DE 59814171 D1 20080403

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814171

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131219

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814171

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101218

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080220

2008-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814171 P 20080403

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/66 20060101AFI20071106BHEP

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONNECTOR HAVING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/66 A, 7H 01R 23/70 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI