Global patent index - EP 0929132 A3

EP 0929132 A3 2000-07-05 - A lamp holder with a cable fast locking means

Title (en)

A lamp holder with a cable fast locking means

Title (de)

Eine Lampenfassung mit Schnellverriegelung des Anschlusskabels

Title (fr)

Une douille de lampe avec un blocage rapide du câble

Publication

EP 0929132 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204276 A

Priority

IT MI980005 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0929132A2] A lamp holder, with cable fast locking means, comprising a bell shaped lamp holder body (10), made of a plastic insulating material of any kind, said body comprises a screw coupling (12) for a lamp, and a rear closed portion (11), wherein there are provided clamps, contacts and holes (13) in which electric wires (14) are inserted, and a cap (16), made of a plastic insulating material, and provided with a central hole (33), in said body (10) the closed rear portion (11) has a fast locking device for the cap (16), said device is formed by a couple of channel shaped housings (17) obtained in the body (10) and suitable to receive a couple of extensions (18) of the cap (16) in order to steadily position and lock the lamp holder, said cap is partially hollow and has, inside, engagement means (26, 27) on a through cable (15) which gathers the electric wires (14), said engagement means steadily locking the cable (15) only when the couple of extensions (18) of the cap are firmly engaged into the couple of channel shaped housings (17) of the lamp holder body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/05; H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 33/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/582 (2013.01); H01R 33/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0929132 A2 19990714; EP 0929132 A3 20000705; IT 243709 Y1 20020306; IT MI980005 U1 19990708

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1023451

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI