Global Patent Index - EP 0929134 A3

EP 0929134 A3 2001-05-23 - Carbon brush holder

Title (en)

Carbon brush holder

Title (de)

Kohlehalter

Title (fr)

Porte-balai pour balai en charbon

Publication

EP 0929134 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100294 A

Priority

DE 29800274 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0929134A2] The carbon brush holder (10) has a cover member which is releasably connected to the brush holder. The cover member has an opening at the front and is locked to the brush holder via sections (34) extending along opposite walls (14) of the brush holder. An Independent claim is included for a carbon brush holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/38; H02K 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/38 (2006.01); H01R 39/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/385 (2013.01); H01R 39/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29800274 U1 19990512; EP 0929134 A2 19990714; EP 0929134 A3 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 39/38 A, 7H 02K 5/14 B

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI