Global Patent Index - EP 0929246 B1

EP 0929246 B1 2000-11-02 - SHELF SYSTEM

Title (en)

SHELF SYSTEM

Title (de)

REGALSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RAYONNAGE

Publication

EP 0929246 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941912 A

Priority

  • DE 29614265 U
  • EP 9704247 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2263470A1] A shelf system has supporting rods (2) and shelf boards (3) provided with fastening devices for fastening them to the supporting rods (2) at various heights. The supporting rods are usually arranged in the corner areas of the rectangular shelf boards. Bores are pierced at certain heights in the supporting rods into which fastening elements such as supporting pegs can be plugged to hold the shelf boards at the corresponding height. The object of the invention is a novel shelf system which allows the height of the shelf boards to be continuously adjusted and in which the position of the shelf boards can be adjusted within a certain angular range. For that purpose, the supporting rods (2) are cylindrical and each shelf board (3) has in the middle of each of its face edges (4) a fastening device which consists of a pair of parallel clamping pins (5) which project beyond the respective face edge (4) and which are interconnected by a clamping screw (6) which pulls together both clamping pins (5), a supporting rod (2) being clamped between each pair of clamping pins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/26 (2006.01); A47B 87/00 (2006.01); A47B 96/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/26 (2013.01); A47B 87/007 (2013.01); A47B 96/1425 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614265 U1 19961002; AT 197231 T 20001115; CA 2263470 A1 19980226; EP 0929246 A1 19990721; EP 0929246 B1 20001102; ES 2154055 T3 20010316; US 6443319 B1 20020903; WO 9807351 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2004-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030912

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030805

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SANDER JULIAN

- Effective date: 20020831

2003-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154055 T3

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702577 20001207

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197231 T 20001115

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990204

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL