Global Patent Index - EP 0929248 A4

EP 0929248 A4 2000-02-02 - INTERACTIVE MULTIPLE BLADDER SEATING COMFORT ADJUSTEMENT

Title (en)

INTERACTIVE MULTIPLE BLADDER SEATING COMFORT ADJUSTEMENT

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVE VERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SITZ MIT MEHREREN LUFTZELLEN

Title (fr)

REGLAGE DE CONFORT INTERACTIF POUR UN SIEGE EQUIPE D'UN SYSTEME A ALVEOLES D'AIR MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0929248 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97951680 A

Priority

  • US 9722960 W
  • US 80851197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6088643A] A system of inflatable air cells is constructed and installed in a seat at locations that are strategic to the comfort of the user. The air cells are connected to a pump through a manifold which sequentially connects each cell independently to the pump. The manifold controls the flow of fluid in the air cell distribution system by means of a system of valves and senses the pressure in each cell by means of a transducer. A microcomputer is programmed with data representing a desired comfort level for each of the air cells. By sequentially activating individual manifold valves, a pressure signal from the transducer can be generated for each cell. The pressure signals are received by the microcomputer and are correlated with the predetermined comfort data to generate a control signal which activates the pump. In this manner each of the cells can be individually inflated or deflated to the desired pressure level. By varying the number and location of the cells the system becomes responsive to the localized pressures exerted on the body for a great variety of users.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/00; A47C 7/14; A47C 27/10; B60N 2/02; B60N 2/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/14 (2006.01); A47C 4/54 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01); A47C 7/62 (2006.01); A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01); B60N 2/02 (2006.01); B60N 2/44 (2006.01); B60N 2/62 (2006.01); B60N 2/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/4415 (2013.01); A47C 4/54 (2013.01); A47C 7/467 (2013.01); A47C 27/082 (2013.01); A47C 27/083 (2013.01); A47C 27/10 (2013.01); B60N 2/4492 (2015.04); B60N 2/62 (2013.01); B60N 2/66 (2013.01); B60N 2/665 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9837790A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6088643 A 20000711; AR 011171 A1 20000802; CA 2250710 A1 19980903; EP 0929248 A1 19990721; EP 0929248 A4 20000202; JP 2000510029 A 20000808; US 6098000 A 20000801; WO 9837790 A1 19980903

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050511

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CTEX SEAT COMFORT LIMITED

2000-12-20 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-02-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL