Global Patent Index - EP 0929283 B1

EP 0929283 B1 2000-04-12 - PATIENT HANDLING DEVICE

Title (en)

PATIENT HANDLING DEVICE

Title (de)

PATIENTENBEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION D'UN PATIENT

Publication

EP 0929283 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940252 A

Priority

  • GB 9702493 W
  • GB 9619504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811859A1] The patient handling device comprises two frame members (10, 30). Each frame member is adapted to support a part of the body of a patient. The frame members are pivotably connected together. Actuating means, such as a rotary actuator (15), is provided for pivoting the frame members relative to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1053 (2013.01); A61G 7/10 (2013.01); A61G 2200/32 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811859 A1 19980326; AU 4215597 A 19980414; DE 69701705 D1 20000518; DE 69701705 T2 20001102; EP 0929283 A1 19990721; EP 0929283 B1 20000412; GB 2317874 A 19980408; GB 9619504 D0 19961030; GB 9719437 D0 19971112

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070915

2006-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060903

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701705 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOUTHAMPTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS NHS TRUST

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990831

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990218

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL