Global Patent Index - EP 0929370 B1

EP 0929370 B1 2001-05-23 - DEVICE FOR THE AUTOMATIC CONVEYANCE OF WORKPIECES ON A MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE AUTOMATIC CONVEYANCE OF WORKPIECES ON A MULTISTAGE METAL-FORMING MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN TRANSPORT VON WERKSTÜCKEN AN EINER MEHRSTUFIGEN UMFORMMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT AUTOMATIQUE DE PIECES SUR UNE MACHINE DE FORMAGE A ETAGES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0929370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918875 A

Priority

  • CH 9700366 W
  • CH 241096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814289A1] A device for the automatic conveyance of workpieces on a multistage metal-forming machine tool with a tong case (1) located on a cross conveyor tube (2). Tong case (1) comprises a base body (10) on which interchangeable tong cartridges (12a, 12b, 12c), each with a pair of tongs enabling workpiece (W2,W3) to be gripped laterally from above, are placed. Each pair of tongs is connected via a coupling point (19) to means of transmission associated thereto. Said means interact with a control shaft (3) which is placed rotatably in the cross conveyor tube (2) to control opening and closing movement of tongs. Conveyance of a workpiece (W2, W3), grasped by one pair of tongs with twin interacting grippers (130, 140), from one metal-forming station (U1,U2,U3) to a neighbouring metal-forming station (U2,U3,U4) and the return movement of the tongs occur when the cross conveyor tube (2) moves back and forth. Tong travel can be adapted to workpieces by using tong cartridges (12a,12b, 12c) with tongs having appropriate lever ratios.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 27/00 (2006.01); B21K 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21K 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814289 A1 19980409; AU 4293597 A 19980424; CN 1072045 C 20011003; CN 1228723 A 19990915; CZ 288949 B6 20011017; CZ 9901113 A3 20000712; DE 59703614 D1 20010628; EA 000551 B1 19991028; EA 199900076 A1 19990826; EP 0929370 A1 19990721; EP 0929370 B1 20010523; ES 2157069 T3 20010801; JP 2000507509 A 20000620; JP 3397327 B2 20030414; KR 20000022397 A 20000425; TW 378163 B 20000101; US 6247578 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080909

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- HATEBUR UMFORMMASCHINEN AG#GENERAL GUISAN-STRASSE 21#CH-4153 REINACH (CH)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157069 T3

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703614 20010628

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000828

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990104

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL