Global Patent Index - EP 0929386 B1

EP 0929386 B1 2000-06-21 - BUILDING MATERIAL AND A PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A BUILDING MATERIAL

Title (en)

BUILDING MATERIAL AND A PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A BUILDING MATERIAL

Title (de)

BAUSTOFF UND VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUSTOFFS

Title (fr)

MATERIAU DE CONSTRUCTION, ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0929386 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943776 A

Priority

  • DE 9702074 W
  • DE 19640622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19640622A1] This invention concerns an economical way to use shives, previously considered to be waste material, in the production of building materials. To that effect, shives of bast fiber or plant origin are targetedly added to bast fiber and a bonding agent. The shives can contain fibers which are not completely released and remain naturally attached. These fibers project laterally from the shives in an irregular fashion and are between 2 mm and 100 mm long. The shives and the loose fibers and/or the shives with the non-completely released fibers are fed, after corresponding dispersion and dosage, into a coating device for liquid additives and/or into a scatter system for solid additives, and subsequently evacuated as fleece or cake, during which mechanical matting can be performed by air flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/04 (2006.01); B27N 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19640622 A1 19980409; DE 19640622 C2 19981112; AU 4549397 A 19980424; BR 9713245 A 19991103; CA 2267418 A1 19980409; CN 1096347 C 20021218; CN 1231630 A 19991013; EP 0929386 A1 19990721; EP 0929386 B1 20000621; ES 2149011 T3 20001016; HU 0000099 A2 20000528; HU 0000099 A3 20011228; JP 2000503925 A 20000404; PL 184347 B1 20021031; PL 332599 A1 19990927; WO 9814313 A1 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050917

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-09-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-09-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050916

2004-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149011 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB