Global Patent Index - EP 0929432 B1

EP 0929432 B1 2000-04-05 - TRACTION DEVICE FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES

Title (en)

TRACTION DEVICE FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES

Title (de)

ZUGEINRICHTUNG FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRACTION POUR VEHICULE FERROVIAIRE

Publication

EP 0929432 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97912115 A

Priority

  • DE 19641572 A
  • EP 9705462 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19641572A1] A traction device for railway vehicles comprising essentially a supporting plate (8) which can be connected to the side of the vehicle, a spring unit (7) and a traction element (1) connecting a spring unit (7) to a coupling arm (6) of a traction hook or an automatic traction coupling. Traction element (1) is made of two fishplates (2, 3) arranged at a distance to each other and connected to each other by a rear connecting pin (4) cooperating with the spring unit (7) and a front connecting pin (5) which accommodates the coupling arm (6) at the same time. Both fishplates (2, 3) are placed in a longitudinally displaceable position and guided in the supporting plate (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 9/04; B61G 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/04 (2006.01); B61G 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 9/045 (2013.01); B61G 9/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19641572 A1 19980416; AT 191408 T 20000415; CZ 9900925 A3 19991215; EP 0929432 A1 19990721; EP 0929432 B1 20000405; PL 184381 B1 20021031; PL 332862 A1 19991025; RO 120129 B1 20050930; SK 45999 A3 20000118; WO 9815446 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EISENBAHNTECHNIK HALBERSTADT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RINGFEDER BAHNTECHNIK G.M.B.H. K.G.

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001025

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001017

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701419 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191408 T 20000415

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI