Global Patent Index - EP 0929455 B1

EP 0929455 B1 2003-06-18 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A COMBINATION PACKAGING BEAKER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A COMBINATION PACKAGING BEAKER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BECHERFÖRMIGEN KOMBI-VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN POT D'EMBALLAGE COMPOSITE

Publication

EP 0929455 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942227 A

Priority

  • CH 9600457 W
  • CH 236196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813270A1] This invention concerns a process for producing a cup-shaped combination packing container (16) which consists of an inner cup-shaped plastic part (1) which tapers inward moving downward and an outer casing-like plastic part (12) which lies adjacent to and surrounds the inner cup-shaped plastic part (1). The casing-like outer part (12) is pushed over the finished extruded cup-shaped plastic inner part (1) and subsequently affixed to it, which improves the rigidity of the completed container and simplifies production and logistics. Moreover, a combination packing container is disclosed which has a plastic inner part with a recess (19, 19') which stands back inwardly for receiving additional objects (20) between the plastic inner part and the outer part pushed over it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/36; B65D 77/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/36 (2006.01); B65D 77/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/36 (2013.01); B65D 77/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813270 A1 19980402; AT 243140 T 20030715; AU 1136897 A 19980417; CH 690431 A5 20000915; DE 19681654 D2 19990909; DE 59610545 D1 20030724; EP 0929455 A1 19990721; EP 0929455 B1 20030618; EP 0929455 B9 20100526; GB 2333087 A 19990714; GB 2333087 B 20000719; GB 9906957 D0 19990519; IL 129134 A 20010808; IL 129134 D0 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 243140 T

- Effective date: 20161220

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161219

2017-01-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161219

2016-12-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161219

2016-12-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610545

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-09-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610545 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A COMBINATION PACKAGING BEAKER

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990227

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL