Global patent index - EP 0929467 B1

EP 0929467 B1 2000-03-08 - PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSEDBY TWISTS AND PACKAGING METHOD

Title (en)

PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSEDBY TWISTS AND PACKAGING METHOD

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSUMSCHLAG, WELCHER DURCH VERDREHEN GESCHLOSSEN WIRD UND VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE D'EMBALLAGE FERMEE PAR DES PAPILLOTES ET PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 0929467 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96934592 A

Priority

  • BE 9501085 A
  • EP 9604378 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9724273A1] A packaging wrapper consisting of a sheet sealable by means of at least one foil (22) and including an internal cold sealing coating arranged in two longitudinal strips (12, 14) on either side of the item to be packaged for retaining the foils. The sheet further comprises at least one additional transverse strip (24, 26) of cold sealing coating extending along one edge of the sheet (20) perpendicularly to the longitudinal strips (12, 14). The packaging method comprises closing the wrapper by means of the transverse strips (24, 26) in a direction parallel to the axis that passes through the foils (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/14 (2006.01); B65D 75/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/10 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24777 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24793 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2481 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24818 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2486 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2813 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9724273 A1 19970710; AT 190287 T 20000315; AU 704044 B2 19990415; AU 7288396 A 19970728; BE 1009877 A3 19971007; BR 9608171 A 19990209; CA 2227735 A1 19970710; CA 2227735 C 20060131; CN 1071691 C 20010926; CN 1189137 A 19980729; CZ 289226 B6 20011212; CZ 9800055 A3 19990616; DE 69607044 D1 20000413; DE 69607044 T2 20001012; DE 69607044 T3 20040318; DK 0929467 T3 20000731; DK 0929467 T4 20030922; EE 03478 B1 20010815; EE 9700307 A 19980615; EP 0929467 A1 19990721; EP 0929467 B1 20000308; EP 0929467 B2 20030528; ES 2143234 T3 20000501; ES 2143234 T5 20031201; GR 3033520 T3 20000929; HK 1017872 A1 20020308; HU 9900140 A2 19990428; HU 9900140 A3 20041228; JP 2001515436 A 20010918; JP 3818545 B2 20060906; KR 100417673 B1 20041106; MX 9803828 A 19980930; MY 117796 A 20040830; NO 312951 B1 20020722; NO 975926 A 19980210; NO 975926 D0 19971216; NZ 320186 A 19981028; PL 182660 B1 20020228; PL 323588 A1 19980414; PT 929467 E 20000630; RU 2136560 C1 19990910; SI 0929467 T1 20000831; SI 0929467 T2 20040430; SK 283172 B6 20030304; SK 9898 A3 19980506; TR 9701724 T1 19980521; US 5935686 A 19990810; ZA 9610893 B 19970627

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161007

2016-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-10-12 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20161007

2016-10-10 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20161008

2016-10-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69607044

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-26 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM9D

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 190287

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-08-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20120511

2012-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030403388

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-04-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101004

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2003-11-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2003-09-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030403388

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-09-22 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2003-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-07-15 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2003-06-25 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2003-06-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2003-05-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: LT LV SI

2003-03-19 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSED BY TWISTS

2002-11-20 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSEDBY TWISTS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PACTEC VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN-FABRIK THEEGARTEN GMBH

2001-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PACTEC VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN-FABRIK THEEGARTEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143234

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607044

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19971110;LV PAYMENT 19971110;SI PAYMENT 19971110

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190287

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSEDBY TWISTS AND PACKAGING METHOD

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990726

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971110

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19971110;LV PAYMENT 19971110;SI PAYMENT 19971110