Global Patent Index - EP 0929473 B1

EP 0929473 B1 2000-04-19 - CLOSING DEVICE FOR THE DISPENSING OPENING OF A FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSER

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE FOR THE DISPENSING OPENING OF A FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSER

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS FÜR DIE AUSGABEÖFFNUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION DE L'ORIFICE DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUITS FLUIDES

Publication

EP 0929473 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930602 A

Priority

  • FR 9701149 W
  • FR 9608142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2750406A1] The invention discloses a closing device for the dispensing opening (5) of a fluid product dispenser, the said dispenser comprising a container (2), dispensing means (1) and actuating means (4), characterised in that the said closing device comprises a movable cap (10) which, in closed position, sealingly closes the said opening (5), the said cap (10) comprising fixing means (15) to hold fixedly the said cap (10) on the dispenser and avoid an unwanted removal of the cap (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/40; B05B 11/00; B65D 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 50/04 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/0032 (2013.01); B05B 11/3025 (2013.01); B65D 50/045 (2013.01); B65D 83/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2750406 A1 19980102; FR 2750406 B1 19980828; DE 69701745 D1 20000525; DE 69701745 T2 20001228; EP 0929473 A1 19990721; EP 0929473 B1 20000419; WO 9800354 A1 19980108

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160626

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701745

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701745

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 69701745

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701745

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701745

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69701745

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701745 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990122

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT