Global Patent Index - EP 0929492 B1

EP 0929492 B1 2003-06-04 - TAPE ROLL STRUCTURE FOR USE IN MAKING MARGINAL EDGE TABS FOR SHEETS

Title (en)

TAPE ROLL STRUCTURE FOR USE IN MAKING MARGINAL EDGE TABS FOR SHEETS

Title (de)

BANDROLLENSTRUKTUR ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON KANTENREITERN FÜR BOGEN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE ROULEAU DE BANDE UTILISEE DANS LA CONFECTION D'ONGLET DE BORDS DE MARGE POUR FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0929492 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96934046 A

Priority

US 9615939 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814393A1] A tape roll structure which includes a tape having adhesive on one face, and the tape can be pulled off a tape roll and cut into segments of varying lengths. The tape is provided with a paper tape or coating on one or both sides for receiving written indicia, and which becomes part of a tape segment. Thus, once a tape segment has been attached by adhesive to a marginal edge of a sheet, written indicia can be written on the paper tape or coating so that a tab is immediately formed on a sheet. In preferred embodiment, a pair of tape rolls (12, 14) are mounted in a shell (16) and one of the tape rolls (12) carries a paper tape (34) and the other tape roll (14) carries adhesive tape (40). When the two tapes are pulled from their rolls, the paper tape (34) moves into bonded engagement with one-half of the adhesive tape (40) of the other roll. Then the tapes are cut into a segment and bonded to the sheet to which a tab is to be mounted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00; B65H 18/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/07 (2006.01); B42F 21/04 (2006.01); B65H 18/28 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2013.01); B42F 21/04 (2013.01); B65H 35/0026 (2013.01); B65H 35/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814393 A1 19980409; AU 721659 B2 20000713; AU 7256196 A 19980424; CA 2266397 A1 19980409; DE 69628592 D1 20030710; DE 69628592 T2 20040506; EP 0929492 A1 19990721; EP 0929492 B1 20030604; JP 2001501158 A 20010130; KR 20000048898 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091004

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628592 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL