Global Patent Index - EP 0929535 A4

EP 0929535 A4 2001-05-23 - PROCESS AND NOVEL INTERMEDIATES

Title (en)

PROCESS AND NOVEL INTERMEDIATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND NEUE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET NOUVEAUX INTERMEDIAIRES

Publication

EP 0929535 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941446 A

Priority

  • US 9715703 W
  • US 2552196 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9809955A1] This invention provides intermediates and processes useful for the preparation of crytophycin compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 291/02; C07C 227/06; C07C 227/16; C07C 227/18; C07C 229/12; C07C 231/02; C07C 235/26; C07D 273/00; C07D 285/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 273/08 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 227/06 (2006.01); C07C 227/16 (2006.01); C07C 227/18 (2006.01); C07C 229/12 (2006.01); C07C 229/36 (2006.01); C07C 231/02 (2006.01); C07C 235/34 (2006.01); C07C 291/02 (2006.01); C07D 273/00 (2006.01); C07D 273/01 (2006.01); C07D 291/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 273/00 (2013.01); C07C 229/36 (2013.01); C07C 235/34 (2013.01); C07C 291/02 (2013.01); C07D 291/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PY] WO 9731632 A1 19970904 - LILLY CO ELI [US], et al
  • [PY] WO 9640184 A1 19961219 - UNIV HAWAII [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9517959 A1 19950706 - RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al
  • [X] US 4739120 A 19880419 - ZUCKERMAN MARIE F [US]
  • [X] EP 0518295 A2 19921216 - MILLIPORE CORP [US]
  • [Y] EP 0383170 A2 19900822 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0422566 A1 19910417 - POLI IND CHIMICA SPA [IT]
  • [PY] SALAMONCZYK G ET AL: "TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF CRYPTOPHYCINS VIA A CHEMOENZYMATIC APPROACH", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, vol. 61, no. 20, 1 October 1996 (1996-10-01), pages 6893 - 6900, XP000674616, ISSN: 0022-3263
  • [XD] BARROW R A ET AL: "TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF CRYPTOPHYCINS. REVISION OF THE STRUCTURES OF CRYPTOPHYCINS A AND C", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 117, no. 9, 8 March 1995 (1995-03-08), pages 2479 - 2490, XP002066281, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • See also references of WO 9809955A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9809955 A1 19980312; AU 4335297 A 19980326; CA 2263764 A1 19980312; EP 0929535 A1 19990721; EP 0929535 A4 20010523; JP 2001502298 A 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030408

2001-05-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990303

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE