Global Patent Index - EP 0929630 B1

EP 0929630 B1 2001-12-12 - PASTE-LIKE WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT

Title (en)

PASTE-LIKE WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT

Title (de)

PASTENFÖRMIGES WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT PATEUX

Publication

EP 0929630 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944804 A

Priority

  • DE 19636035 A
  • EP 9704690 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19636035A1] A paste-like washing and cleaning agent contains non-ionic surfactants, organic and/or inorganic builders, alkalising agents and if required bleaching agents, enzymes, greying-inhibiting polymers and/or other usual ingredients and is characterised in that it is free from synthetic anionic surfactants of the alkyl benzene sulphonate type and in that it contains 5 to 30 wt % of an ethoxylated alcohol of general formula (I): R<1>-(OC2H4)m-OH, in which R<1> stands for an alkyl or alkenyl radical with 12 to 14 C atoms and can take a mean ethoxylation value m from 1 to 8; 1 to 20 wt % of an ethoxylated alcohol of general formula (II): R<2>-(OC2H4)n-OH, in which R<2> stands for an alkyl or alkenyl radical with 12 to 22 C atoms and can take a mean ethoxylation value n from 3 to 14, provided that n be higher than m by at least 1.0; 20 to 80 wt % alkalising agents; 1 to 20 wt %, in particular 3 to 15 wt % of a long-chain alcohol or alkyl ether of general formula (III): R<3>-O-R<4>, in which R<3> is an alkyl or alkenyl radical with 8 to 22 C atoms and R<4> is hydrogen or an alkyl radical with 1 to 6 C atoms; and up to 5 wt % organic builders of the polymer polycarboxylate type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/20; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 17/0004 (2013.01); C11D 17/003 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19636035 A1 19980312; AT 210717 T 20011215; CA 2264838 A1 19980312; DK 0929630 T3 20020422; EP 0929630 A1 19990721; EP 0929630 B1 20011212; NO 319284 B1 20050711; NO 991069 A 19990304; NO 991069 D0 19990304; PL 331858 A1 19990816; US 6248708 B1 20010619; WO 9810049 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-09-04 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170828

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-05 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050805

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL-ECOLAB G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705800 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210717 T 20011215

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990225

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE