Global Patent Index - EP 0929648 B1

EP 0929648 B1 2002-09-04 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY NON-TOWER PROCESS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY NON-TOWER PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINER WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG NACH OHNE-TURM-VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE SANS L'UTILISATION D'UNE TOUR

Publication

EP 0929648 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928871 A

Priority

  • US 9709789 W
  • US 9615881 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814557A1] A non-tower process for continuously preparing granular detergent composition having a density of at least about 600 g/l is provided. The process comprises the steps of (a) dispersing a surfactant, and coating the surfactant with fine powder in a mixer, wherein first agglomerates are formed, (b) thoroughly mixing the first agglomerates in a mixer, wherein second agglomerates are formed, and (c) granulating the second agglomerates in one or more fluidizing apparatus. The process can also comprise further step (b'), i.e., spraying finely atomized liquid onto the second agglomerates in a mixer, between step (b) and step (c).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 11/00 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 11/02 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814557 A1 19980409; AR 010507 A1 20000628; AR 010508 A1 20000628; AR 010509 A1 20000628; AR 010510 A1 20000628; AR 010511 A1 20000628; AR 010729 A1 20000712; AT 223476 T 20020915; AT 238409 T 20030515; AT 246726 T 20030815; AT 255159 T 20031215; AT 255160 T 20031215; AU 3303097 A 19980424; AU 3303197 A 19980424; AU 3378597 A 19980424; AU 3478297 A 19980424; AU 3478397 A 19980424; AU 3478497 A 19980424; AU 3478597 A 19980424; AU 3568397 A 19980424; AU 7388196 A 19980424; BR 9612732 A 19990824; BR 9711861 A 19990824; BR 9711865 A 19990824; BR 9712490 A 19991019; BR 9712492 A 19991019; BR 9713246 A 19991103; BR 9713249 A 19991103; CA 2267291 A1 19980409; CA 2267291 C 20021210; CA 2267424 A1 19980409; CA 2267424 C 20040106; CA 2268052 A1 19980409; CA 2268052 C 20031230; CA 2268055 A1 19980409; CA 2268055 C 20040203; CA 2268060 A1 19980409; CA 2268060 C 20030422; CA 2268062 A1 19980409; CA 2268062 C 20021112; CA 2268063 A1 19980409; CA 2268063 C 20021029; CA 2268067 A1 19980409; CA 2268067 C 20040106; CA 2268068 A1 19980409; CA 2268068 C 20030603; CN 1133738 C 20040107; CN 1133739 C 20040107; CN 1156560 C 20040707; CN 1156561 C 20040707; CN 1156562 C 20040707; CN 1156563 C 20040707; CN 1239506 A 19991222; CN 1239507 A 19991222; CN 1239508 A 19991222; CN 1239991 A 19991229; CN 1239992 A 19991229; CN 1239993 A 19991229; CN 1239994 A 19991229; CN 1239995 A 19991229; DE 69715224 D1 20021010; DE 69715224 T2 20030807; DE 69721287 D1 20030528; DE 69721287 T2 20040311; DE 69723986 D1 20030911; DE 69723986 T2 20040603; DE 69726439 D1 20040108; DE 69726439 T2 20040909; DE 69726440 D1 20040108; DE 69726440 T2 20040909; EP 0929645 A1 19990721; EP 0929648 A1 19990721; EP 0929648 B1 20020904; EP 0929649 A1 19990721; EP 0929649 B1 20031126; EP 0929650 A1 19990721; EP 0929650 B1 20030806; EP 0929651 A1 19990721; EP 0929651 B1 20031126; EP 0929652 A1 19990721; EP 0929653 A1 19990721; EP 0929653 B1 20030423; EP 0929654 A1 19990721; EP 0929655 A1 19990721; ES 2178778 T3 20030101; ES 2193386 T3 20031101; ES 2201305 T3 20040316; ES 2210544 T3 20040701; ES 2212109 T3 20040716; JP 2000503715 A 20000328; JP 2000503716 A 20000328; JP 2000503717 A 20000328; JP 2000503718 A 20000328; JP 2000503719 A 20000328; JP 2000503720 A 20000328; JP 2000503721 A 20000328; JP 2000504062 A 20000404; JP 2000507632 A 20000620; JP 3299981 B2 20020708; JP 3299982 B2 20020708; JP 3299983 B2 20020708; JP 3299984 B2 20020708; JP 3299985 B2 20020708; JP 3299986 B2 20020708; JP 3299987 B2 20020708; JP 3305327 B2 20020722; JP 3345022 B2 20021118; MX 219076 B 20040210; MX 219077 B 20040210; MX 9903193 A 20000131; MX 9903195 A 19990930; WO 9814549 A1 19980409; WO 9814551 A1 19980409; WO 9814552 A1 19980409; WO 9814553 A1 19980409; WO 9814554 A1 19980409; WO 9814555 A1 19980409; WO 9814556 A1 19980409; WO 9814558 A1 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060508

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178778 T3

2002-12-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715224 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223476 T 20020915

2000-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000110

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE